IN SB0012 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Public Law 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Semiquincentennial commission. Establishes a commission to commemorate the 250th anniversary of the signing of the Declaration of Independence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Semiquincentennial commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-07SenatePublic Law 3
2022-03-07SenateSigned by the Governor
2022-03-07SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2022-03-01HouseSigned by the Speaker
2022-03-01SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2022-02-23HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2022-02-22HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 223: yeas 91, nays 0
2022-02-21HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2022-02-17HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2022-02-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2022-02-02SenateReferred to the House
2022-02-01SenateCosponsors: Representatives Lehman, Bartlett, Prescott
2022-02-01SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Torr
2022-02-01SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 138: yeas 49, nays 0
2022-01-31SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2022-01-31SenateAmendment #1 (Ford J.D.) prevailed; voice vote
2022-01-31SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2022-01-27SenateSenator Glick added as coauthor
2022-01-27SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2022-01-20SenateSenators Taylor G, Becker, Boehnlein, Ford J.D. added as coauthors
2022-01-18SenateCommittee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2022-01-13SenateSenator Tomes added as coauthor
2022-01-11SenateSenator Raatz added as second author
2022-01-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2022-01-04SenateAuthored by Senator Kruse

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2022/bills/senate/12/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/2/9/292954b6/SB0012.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/5/2/7c52c231/SB0012.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/4/0/0540f13e/SB0012.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/c/1/c8c1f501/SB0012.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/8/c/168c1ec7/SB0012.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/d/b/25db641e/SB0012.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/b/b/fcbb45e1/SB0012.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/2/3/3723ff7b/SB0012.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/e/b/22eb57a5/SB0012.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/0/f/be0fc0ed/SB0012.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/d/b/25db574c/SB0012.06.ENRH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/c/9/5/4c95685f/SB0012.03.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/1/6/cb169943/SB0012.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/6/5/7165892d/SB0012.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/d/b/6/bdb6ab5a/SB0012.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/4/8/0f48ac73/SB0012.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/7/a/467af3ca/SB0012.02.COMS.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/f/8/bef84e47/SB0012.04.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/c/8/5ac87d4c/SB0012.04.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/d/5/46d59905/SB0012.04.ENGS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/d/c/c/1dccacf3/SB0012.05.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/8/c/a38c8c24/SB0012.05.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/8/3/9c83f5a5/SB0012.05.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/e/4/dae4c73b/SB0012.06.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/d/d/0eddcf93/SB0012.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/b/e/c/abec9735/SB0012.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/8/d/f28d3a89/SB0012.138_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/4/2/9/74296a47/SB0012.04.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/c/d/9bcd78f3/SB0012.223_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback