IN SB0010 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Representative Shackleford added as cosponsor
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Representative Shackleford added as cosponsor
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Marion County violent crime reduction pilot. Permits establishment of the: (1) Marion County violent crime reduction pilot project; and (2) Marion County violent crime reduction pilot project fund; to identify violent crime reduction districts in Marion County and to provide grants for overtime, violent crime reduction programs, and additional law enforcement services in the violent crime reduction districts. Defines "violent crime reduction district".
Title
Marion County violent crime reduction pilot.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Representative Shackleford added as cosponsor |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-02-08 | House | Representative Gore M added as cosponsor |
2022-01-31 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senator Koch added as coauthor |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Speedy |
2022-01-25 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Jeter |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 65: yeas 46, nays 1 |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senator Baldwin added as coauthor |
2022-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senators Freeman and Walker K |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senators Crider, Young M, Sandlin |