IN SB0006 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Bail for violent arrestees. Defines "violent crime", "violent arrestee", "repeat violent arrestee", and "minimum bail amount", and requires: (1) a court to review the probable cause affidavit or arrest warrant before releasing a violent arrestee or repeat violent arrestee on bail; (2) bail to be set for a violent arrestee or repeat violent arrestee following a hearing in open court; and (3) a repeat violent arrestee released on bail to pay 100% of the minimum bail amount by cash deposit. Prohibits a third party who is not a close relative of a repeat violent arrestee from posting bail for the repeat violent arrestee. Requires mandatory bail revocation for a violent arrestee who commits a felony while released. Provides for victim notification of bail hearings. Requires nonmonetary release for non-violent arrestees under certain circumstances. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Bail for violent arrestees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senator Koch added as coauthor |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Speedy and Jeter C |
2022-01-25 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Behning |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 61: yeas 36, nays 11 |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Senator Baldwin added as coauthor |
2022-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senators Walker K and Crider |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senators Young M, Sandlin, Freeman |