IN SB0006 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Public Law 86
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Public Law 86
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Technical corrections. Resolves technical conflicts and addresses technical problems in the Indiana Code, including removal of obsolete citation style references to "IC 1971" and updating the list of statutes codified outside Title 34 that confer immunity from civil liability. Provides that the technical corrections bill may be referred to as the "technical corrections bill of the 2018 general assembly". Specifies that this phrase may be used in the lead-in line of each SECTION of another bill to identify the provisions added, amended, or repealed by the technical corrections bill that are also amended or repealed in another bill being considered
Title
Technical corrections. Resolves technical conflicts and addresses technical problems in the Indiana Code, including removal of obsolete citation style references to "IC 1971" and updating the list of statutes codified outside Title 34 that confer immunity from civil liability. Provides that the technical corrections bill may be referred to as the "technical corrections bill of the 2018 general assembly". Specifies that this phrase may be used in the lead-in line of each SECTION of another bill to identify the provisions added, amended, or repealed by the technical corrections bill that are also amended or repealed in another bill being considered
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Zakas [R] | Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. John Young [R] |
Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public Law 86 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-02 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2018-03-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 271: yeas 89, nays 0 |
2018-02-28 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-26 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-15 | House | Representative Steuerwald added as cosponsor |
2018-02-15 | House | Representative Steuerwald added as cosponsor |
2018-02-15 | House | Representative Young J added as sponsor |
2018-02-15 | House | Representative Steuerwald removed as sponsor |
2018-02-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2018-01-18 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Steuerwald |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 20: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Senator Young M added as second author |
2018-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Zakas |