IN SB0003 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-02 - First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions
Pending: House Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits certain financial institutions from establishing a branch on or within one and one-half miles of the premises or property of an affiliate that is a retail merchant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bank branches in or near retail merchants.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-02 First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions
2010-01-26 Senator Zakas added as second author
2010-01-26 Cosponsors: Reps. Michael and Borror
2010-01-26 House sponsor: Rep. Stemler
2010-01-26 Referred to the House
2010-01-26 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 47: Yeas 27 and Nays 22
2010-01-26 Senator Taylor added as coauthor
2010-01-25 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-01-21 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
2010-01-05 Authored by Senator Holdman

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback