IN SB0002 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Public Law 148
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Public Law 148
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Various education matters. Provides that, in determining whether at least 50% of the instructional services that a student receives from a school corporation is virtual instruction for purposes of the 2021 fall count of ADM, the department of education (department) shall review the attendance of each student on each school day from the school corporation's first day of school until the school corporation's last day of school of the 2021 fall semester. Makes an exception regarding the school days the department reviews for students who transferred to or from a school corporation during the 2021 fall semester. Provides that, if a school corporation's tuition support amount is adjusted as a result of the application of this provision, the department shall, after December 31, 2021, settle any overpayment or underpayment of state tuition support to a school corporation resulting from the adjustment of tuition support on the schedule determined by the department. Requires each school corporation and charter school to annually report to the department the number of students who, during the students' expected graduation year: (1) were enrolled in the school corporation on the September ADM count day; (2) completed graduation requirements before the February ADM count day; and (3) were not enrolled in the school corporation on the February ADM count day. Requires, not later than September 1 of each year, the department to: (1) compile and prepare a report regarding the information reported by school corporations and charter schools; and (2) submit the report to the legislative council.
Title
Various education matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Senate | Public Law 148 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-08 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 371: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 355: yeas 49, nays 1 |
2022-03-08 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2022-03-08 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | House advisors appointed: Cherry, Thompson and DeLaney |
2022-03-03 | House | House conferees appointed: Behning and Smith V |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Kruse and Ford J.D. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Raatz and Qaddoura |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2022-02-25 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2022-02-24 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 285: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2022-02-23 | House | Amendment #2 (Thompson) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-02-23 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-02-21 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2022-02-10 | House | Representative Goodrich added as cosponsor |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-31 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senators Brown L, Charbonneau, Garten, Holdman, Mishler added as coauthors |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senator Melton added as coauthor |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senator Bassler added as coauthor |
2022-01-24 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Behning |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 40: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as coauthor |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senators Donato, Leising, Buchanan, Qaddoura added as coauthors |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as second author |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Raatz |