IN SB0002 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Public Law 36
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Public Law 36
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint agency matters. Makes the following changes to the statute concerning joint agencies formed by municipalities for the purpose of undertaking the planning, financing, ownership, and operation of certain projects to supply electric power for present or future energy needs: (1) Eliminates the requirements that for purposes of the statute, a municipality must be located in Indiana. (2) Specifies that a joint agency is considered a governmental entity for purposes of the statute governing tort claims against governmental entities and public employees. (3) Provides that a person may not serve as a commissioner on the board of commissioners of a
Title
Joint agency matters. Makes the following changes to the statute concerning joint agencies formed by municipalities for the purpose of undertaking the planning, financing, ownership, and operation of certain projects to supply electric power for present or future energy needs: (1) Eliminates the requirements that for purposes of the statute, a municipality must be located in Indiana. (2) Specifies that a joint agency is considered a governmental entity for purposes of the statute governing tort claims against governmental entities and public employees. (3) Provides that a person may not serve as a commissioner on the board of commissioners of a
Sponsors
Sen. James Merritt [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Timothy Lanane [D] |
Rep. David Ober [R] | Rep. Dale DeVon [R] | Rep. Karlee Macer [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Public Law 36 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2017-03-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 276: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2017-03-20 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-16 | House | Representative Macer added as cosponsor |
2017-03-16 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative DeVon |
2017-01-24 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Ober |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 21: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as coauthor |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Senator Koch added as second author |
2017-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Merritt |