IN SB0002 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-15 - Senator Broden added as coauthor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-15 - Senator Broden added as coauthor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
and Indiana flags. Provides a state sales tax exemption for sales of the flag of the United States or the flag of the state of Indiana. Limits the sales tax exemption to flags that are made in America and: (1) at least three feet by five feet in size; or (2) purchased or sold by veterans organizations (regardless of the size of the flag).
Title
Sales tax exemption for U.S.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce, Economic Development & Technology - Roll Call 000201 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-15 | Senate | Senator Broden added as coauthor. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Senator Smith added as coauthor. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Committee report: amended, reassigned to |
2014-01-07 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Commerce, Economic Development & Technology |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Steele |