IN SB0001 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes various changes concerning the members of the youth advisory council. Establishes the youth advisory council fund (fund). Specifies the purposes of the fund. Moves the functions of the athletic commission to the gaming commission. Transfers the duties of the home health care services and hospice services council to the health facilities council. Renames the Indiana health facilities council as the Indiana health facilities, home health care, and hospice council. Changes the membership of the council. Renames the standardbred advisory board the standard bred advisory and breed development board. Eliminates the standardbred advisory committee. Makes changes to the eligibility criteria for admittance to the Indiana veterans' home. Transfers administration of the Indiana veterans' home buildings and grounds from the department of natural resources to the Indiana department of veterans' affairs. Transfers the duties of the commission of veterans' affairs to the Indiana military and veterans' benefits board. Renames the Indiana military and veterans' benefits board the Indiana veterans' affairs commission. Eliminates the law enforcement training board advisory council. Repeals the personnel board (IC 4-15-1, IC 5-15-2-2.2, and IC 4-15-2.5-2); the athletic commission (IC 25-9-1); the transportation corridor planning board ( IC 8-4.5-1-3 and IC 8-4.5-2); the motor vehicle sales advisory board (IC 9-23-1); operation lifesaver program (IC 9-27-2-12; the commission of veterans' affairs (IC 10-17-1-3); the military and veterans' benefits boards (IC 10-17-3-4); the Medicaid work incentive council (IC 12-15-42); New Harmony commission (IC 14-20-4); soldiers' and sailors' children's home advisory committee (IC 16-19-6-9); home health care services and hospice services council (IC 16-27-0.5); radiation control advisory commission (IC 16-41-35-2, IC 16-41-35-16, IC 16-41-35-17, and IC 16-8-2-9); and mandated health benefits task force (IC 27-1-3-30). Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Boards and commissions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-08 First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2010-02-02 Cosponsor: Rep. Espich
2010-02-02 House sponsor: Rep. Crawford
2010-02-02 Referred to the House
2010-02-02 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 86: Yeas 48 and Nays 2
2010-02-01 Amendment 4 (Lawson), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-01 Amendment 6 (Alting), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-01 Amendment 8 (Dillon), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-01 Amendment 7 (Dillon), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-01 Amendment 1 (Dillon), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-01 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2010-01-28 Senator Kenley added as second author
2010-01-25 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-01-14 Senator Dillon added as first author
2010-01-14 Senator Long removed as first author
2010-01-14 Committee report: amended, reassigned to Appropriations
2010-01-14 First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
2010-01-14 Authored by Senator Long

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback