IN HCR0039 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION recognizing the importance of career and technical education during Career and Technical Education Month.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION recognizing the importance of career and technical education during Career and Technical Education Month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | Senate | Returned to the House |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-02-17 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Kruse |
2020-02-17 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2020-02-17 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Leonard and Macer |
2020-02-17 | House | Authored by Representative Lehe |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/resolutions/house/concurrent/39/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/c/1/77c1f168/HC0039.01.INTR.pdf |