IN HCR0020 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing Wednesday, February 14, 2024, as a day to honor the work and mission of the Indiana Region of the American Red Cross. A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION recognizing Wednesday, February 14, 2024, as a day to honor the work and mission of the Indiana Region of the American Red Cross.
Title
Recognizing Wednesday, February 14, 2024, as a day to honor the work and mission of the Indiana Region of the American Red Cross.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | Senate | Returned to the House |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2024-01-30 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2024-01-30 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Karickhoff, Torr, Summers, Porter, Campbell |
2024-01-30 | House | Authored by Representative Clere |
2024-01-30 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Crider, Ford J.D., Yoder |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2024/resolutions/house/concurrent/20/details |
Text | https://iga.in.gov/pdf-documents/123/2024/house/resolutions/HC0020/HC0020.01.INTR.pdf |