IN HCR0017 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Second reading: adopted standing vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to rename the State Road 45 and 2nd Street bridge over I-69 the "Sarah Irene Haylett-Jones Memorial Bridge".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to rename the State Road 45 and 2nd Street bridge over I-69 the "Sarah Irene Haylett-Jones Memorial Bridge".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House - Second reading (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenateSecond reading: adopted standing vote
2020-02-18SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-02-17SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2020-02-13HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-02-13HouseSecond reading: adopted Roll Call 177: yeas 85, nays 0
2020-01-29HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-27HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Koch and Stoops
2020-01-27HouseFirst reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation
2020-01-27HouseCoauthored by Representatives Ellington, Heaton, May, Pierce

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback