IN HB1615 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Public Law 141
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Public Law 141
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Animal cruelty. Amends and creates certain definitions for offenses relating to animals. Specifies that an animal control program, humane society, and governmental entity operating an animal shelter may only destroy an animal by means of humane euthanasia. Removes duplicative language and makes conforming amendments.
Title
Animal cruelty. Amends and creates certain definitions for offenses relating to animals. Specifies that an animal control program, humane society, and governmental entity operating an animal shelter may only destroy an animal by means of humane euthanasia. Removes duplicative language and makes conforming amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - Third reading (Y: 81 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - Third reading (Y: 81 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Public Law 141 |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 549: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2019-04-15 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 408: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Becker) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senators Young M, Koch, Freeman, Sandlin added as cosponsors |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-14 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Becker and Alting |
2019-02-14 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 184: yeas 81, nays 13 |
2019-02-11 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-22 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2019-01-22 | House | Coauthored by Representatives McNamara, VanNatter and Mahan |
2019-01-22 | House | Authored by Representative Hatfield |