IN HB1613 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Law 61
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Law 61
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Transfer of state real property. Requires the conveyance of certain real property by the state to the University of Evansville to remove restrictions on use of the property by the university that were required by legislation enacted in 1988 and 1997.
Title
Transfer of state real property. Requires the conveyance of certain real property by the state to the University of Evansville to remove restrictions on use of the property by the university that were required by legislation enacted in 1988 and 1997.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Hatfield [D] | Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] | Rep. Holli Sullivan [R] | Rep. Matt Hostettler [R] |
Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. Mark Messmer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Public Law 61 |
2019-04-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-03-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 315: yeas 46, nays 0 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-03-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-18 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Becker, Tomes and Messmer |
2019-02-18 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 201: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2019-02-14 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-11 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-29 | House | Representative Hostettler added as coauthor |
2019-01-24 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-01-24 | House | Coauthored by Representatives McNamara and Sullivan |
2019-01-24 | House | Authored by Representative Hatfield |