IN HB1612 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-22 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-22 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Study of former offender employment barriers. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate study committee for study during the 2015 legislative interim the topic of the problems faced by offenders when the offenders are: (1) released from a penal facility; and (2) attempting to find employment; including studying the possibility of establishing programs to encourage employers to hire these offenders.
Title
Study of former offender employment barriers. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate study committee for study during the 2015 legislative interim the topic of the problems faced by offenders when the offenders are: (1) released from a penal facility; and (2) attempting to find employment; including studying the possibility of establishing programs to encourage employers to hire these offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-22 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures |
2015-01-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative McMillin |
2015-01-22 | House | Authored by Representative Summers |