IN HB1596 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expenditures of redevelopment commissions. Provides that except for property tax proceeds transferred to a school corporation or public school, including a charter school, allocated property tax proceeds may be expended for projects located outside an allocation area only if the redevelopment commission adopts a declaratory resolution that finds that the expenditures: (1) will directly benefit the allocation area; or (2) will result in the creation or retention of jobs in the private sector. Adds various requirements related to expenditures under contracts between redevelopment commissions and providers of educational and training programs to establish programs designed to prepare individuals to participate in the competitive and global economy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expenditures of redevelopment commissions. Provides that except for property tax proceeds transferred to a school corporation or public school, including a charter school, allocated property tax proceeds may be expended for projects located outside an allocation area only if the redevelopment commission adopts a declaratory resolution that finds that the expenditures: (1) will directly benefit the allocation area; or (2) will result in the creation or retention of jobs in the private sector. Adds various requirements related to expenditures under contracts between redevelopment commissions and providers of educational and training programs to establish programs designed to prepare individuals to participate in the competitive and global economy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - House - Third reading (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2019-02-26HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-25HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Grooms
2019-02-25HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 295: yeas 55, nays 41
2019-02-21HouseAmendment #2 (Fleming) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-21HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-18HouseRepresentative DeLaney added as coauthor
2019-02-18HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-11HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2019-02-07HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-05HouseRepresentative Clere added as author
2019-02-05HouseRepresentative Fleming removed as author
2019-02-05HouseRepresentative Clere removed as coauthor
2019-01-22HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2019-01-22HouseCoauthored by Representatives Clere, Engleman and Thompson
2019-01-22HouseAuthored by Representative Fleming

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1596/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/2/a/932ae141/HB1596.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/d/3/ead3e877/HB1596.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/1/0/ef10aea7/HB1596.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/8/7/2/b8728665/HB1596.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/4/1/7641398d/HB1596.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/1/a/4/d1a49787/HB1596.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/e/a/f/aeaf4319/HB1596.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/6/1/b/061b4059/HB1596.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/8/7/c887a191/HB1596.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/e/5/69e5d12b/HB1596.06.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/7/a/1/97a176c3/HB1596.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/7/9/a37932c1/HB1596.03.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/0/7/a20732ac/HB1596.295.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback