IN HB1562 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 177
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 177
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Professional licensing matters. Requires an individual who holds a professional license or certificate and who is convicted of a misdemeanor or felony to provide written notice of the conviction to the appropriate professional licensing board not later than 90 days after entry of the order or judgment of conviction. Provides that if a professional license or certificate is initially issued to the holder less than 90 days before the date on which such licenses or certificates generally expire, the license or certificate does not expire on the general expiration date but instead expires at the conclusion of the next licensing
Title
Professional licensing matters. Requires an individual who holds a professional license or certificate and who is convicted of a misdemeanor or felony to provide written notice of the conviction to the appropriate professional licensing board not later than 90 days after entry of the order or judgment of conviction. Provides that if a professional license or certificate is initially issued to the holder less than 90 days before the date on which such licenses or certificates generally expire, the license or certificate does not expire on the general expiration date but instead expires at the conclusion of the next licensing
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Zent [R] | Rep. Ronald Bacon [R] | Rep. Steven Davisson [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Brown [R] |
Sen. Erin Houchin [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce & Technology - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce & Technology - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | House | Public Law 177 |
2015-05-05 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 542: yeas 45, nays 3 |
2015-04-28 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 556: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Advisors appointed: Buck, Broden, Walker and Houchin |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Brown L and Breaux |
2015-04-21 | House | House Advisors appointed: Wolkins, Bauer and Brown C |
2015-04-21 | House | House Conferees appointed: Zent and Shackleford |
2015-04-21 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2015-04-21 | House | Concurrence withdrawn |
2015-04-20 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2015-04-15 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 422: yeas 40, nays 10 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as second sponsor |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Commerce & Technology |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-24 | House | Senator Brown L added as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 252: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2015-02-23 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-19 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-20 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2015-01-20 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Bacon and Davisson |
2015-01-20 | House | Authored by Representative Zent |