IN HB1558 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 217
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Indiana crime guns task force. Establishes the Indiana crime guns task force (task force) to address violent crime in Boone, Hamilton, Hancock, Hendricks, Marion, Morgan, Johnson, and Shelby counties by delivering, in cooperation with state and federal officials, a uniform strategy to trace firearms used to commit crimes. Establishes an executive board to direct and oversee the task force. Requires the Indiana criminal justice institute to establish and administer the task force fund. Makes conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Indiana crime guns task force.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29HousePublic Law 217
2021-04-29HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-23SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-13HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 423: yeas 91, nays 1
2021-04-12HouseMotion to concur filed
2021-04-07SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-04-06SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 362: yeas 49, nays 0
2021-04-05SenateSenator Yoder added as cosponsor
2021-03-30SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-25SenateSenator Qaddoura added as cosponsor
2021-03-25SenateSenator Ford Jon added as cosponsor
2021-03-25SenateSenator Crider added as cosponsor
2021-03-25SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-18SenateSenator Sandlin added as cosponsor
2021-03-18SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2021-03-11SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor
2021-03-08SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2021-02-23HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-22HouseCosponsor: Senator Taylor G
2021-02-22HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Young M, Walker K, Baldwin
2021-02-22HouseRepresentatives McNamara and Bartlett added as coauthors
2021-02-22HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 204: yeas 96, nays 1
2021-02-18HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-16HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-02-11HouseReferred to the Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2021-02-11HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Steuerwald

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1558/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/b/a/b1baefa6/HB1558.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/8/5/3085e628/HB1558.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/d/0/3bd0ba09/HB1558.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/e/7/d/5e7dd9ea/HB1558.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/a/b/a9ab28a0/HB1558.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/4/0/5/8405bb4c/HB1558.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/1/5/4915b80e/HB1558.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/e/b/d6eb1d30/HB1558.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/f/8/b/9f8b3bc4/HB1558.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/7/0/0970e4fc/HB1558.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/2/8/3728320e/HB1558.06.ENRS.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/3/0/1e307c57/HB1558.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/7/a/157a75a0/HB1558.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/e/b/56eb56a6/HB1558.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/1/f/5/11f51c30/HB1558.02.COMH.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/8/d/e08dd95c/HB1558.03.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/4/2/f/c42f4e0f/HB1558.03.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/7/1/ef71971d/HB1558.03.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/9/7/a997d8c9/HB1558.03.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/8/9/51898f35/HB1558.04.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/7/7/0/977014c9/HB1558.04.COMS.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/f/3/0/4f30213e/HB1558.05.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/8/b/3f8b5dea/HB1558.05.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/8/5/88853f68/HB1558.05.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/8/9/d3897bbb/HB1558.05.COMS.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/4/9/f849a4d0/HB1558.06.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/b/5/5fb55ce5/HB1558.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/a/4/9/7a49b6cf/HB1558.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/8/1/4/e814b371/HB1558.204_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/3/c/de3c05e2/HB1558.03.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/b/5/9db59852/HB1558.04.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/0/6/0e066f22/HB1558.362_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/3/4/2934bfe1/HB1558.423_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback