IN HB1555 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Public Law 180
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Public Law 180
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Police reserve officers. Provides that town police reserve officers are eligible for a line of duty death benefit from the special death benefit fund. Adds town police reserve officers to the tuition and fee exemption for the children and surviving spouse of a public safety officer killed in the line of duty. Provides that: (1) after December 31, 2017, a county, city, or town shall furnish without charge to a police reserve officer (officer) who is injured or contracts an illness in the course of or as the result of the performance of duties as an officer all necessary physician,
Title
Police reserve officers. Provides that town police reserve officers are eligible for a line of duty death benefit from the special death benefit fund. Adds town police reserve officers to the tuition and fee exemption for the children and surviving spouse of a public safety officer killed in the line of duty. Provides that: (1) after December 31, 2017, a county, city, or town shall furnish without charge to a police reserve officer (officer) who is injured or contracts an illness in the course of or as the result of the performance of duties as an officer all necessary physician,
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | House | Public Law 180 |
2017-04-25 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-20 | House | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 443: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2017-04-06 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senator Buck added as cosponsor |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 384: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as cosponsor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senator Crane added as cosponsor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senator Eckerty added as second sponsor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-23 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | Representative Zent added as coauthor |
2017-02-21 | House | Representatives Frye and Forestal added as coauthors |
2017-02-21 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Walker |
2017-02-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 184: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2017-02-20 | House | Amendment #1 (Mayfield) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-02-20 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-02-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-23 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2017-01-23 | House | Authored by Representative Mayfield |