IN HB1553 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Public Law 63
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Higher education matters. Changes the eligibility requirements for the next generation Hoosier educators scholarship and provides that a student may qualify for the scholarship by achieving a cumulative grade point average upon graduation of at least a 3.5 on a 4.0 grading scale during grades 9, 10, 11, and 12. Requires the commission for higher education to give priority to an individual who is: (1) a recent high school graduate; (2) pursuing a teacher shortage area; (3) showing significant financial need; or (4) a member of a household with an annual income of not more than the amount required for the individual to qualify for the free or reduced price lunch program as determined for the immediately preceding taxable year. Provides that the National Guard tuition supplement program may be used by a scholarship applicant for graduate credits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher education matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15HousePublic Law 63
2021-04-15HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-08SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-07HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-03-31SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2021-03-30SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 299: yeas 50, nays 0
2021-03-29SenateAmendment #1 (Yoder) failed; voice vote
2021-03-29SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-25SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-03-11SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2021-02-18HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-17HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Walker K and Raatz
2021-02-17HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 156: yeas 93, nays 1
2021-02-15HouseRepresentative Heaton added as coauthor
2021-02-15HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-11HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2021-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representatives Cook and Teshka
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Behning

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1553/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/d/b/23db776c/HB1553.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/9/2/3492b3a1/HB1553.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/7/e/dd7eabdb/HB1553.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/9/5/1995242c/HB1553.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/a/f/0faff07c/HB1553.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/9/8/2298bcf5/HB1553.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/6/e/db6e4b7f/HB1553.04.ENRS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/4/a/b64a23c2/HB1553.03.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/8/0/79809170/HB1553.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/b/1/afb1ca34/HB1553.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/0/8/d/708d6289/HB1553.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/6/1/7d61fe70/HB1553.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/0/2/3/70236f4a/HB1553.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/d/b/78dbfd32/HB1553.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/c/a/12caf9ec/HB1553.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/d/5/6/ed568ad3/HB1553.03.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/d/0/f8d0eb1f/HB1553.03.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/e/8/a2e8a626/HB1553.04.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/6/7/d/c67d363d/HB1553.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/a/0/51a0da6d/HB1553.156_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/5/8/4258f0c8/HB1553.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/9/9/5199d43f/HB1553.299_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback