IN HB1539 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Public Law 159
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Public Law 159
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Financial institutions and consumer credit. Makes various changes to the statutes concerning: (1) first lien mortgage lenders; (2) persons licensed under the Uniform Consumer Credit Code; (3) rental purchase agreements; (4) financial institutions; (5) pawnbrokers; (6) money transmitters; and (7) check cashers. Changes references to the "Federal Consumer Credit Protection Act" to references to the "Consumer Credit Protection Act" throughout these statutes. Removes outdated references to: (1) the Office of Thrift Supervision; and (2) the Federal Reserve Board; throughout the statutes. In the statute concerning rental purchase agreements: (1) repeals the definition of "Federal Consumer Credit Protection Act"; and (2)
Title
Financial institutions and consumer credit. Makes various changes to the statutes concerning: (1) first lien mortgage lenders; (2) persons licensed under the Uniform Consumer Credit Code; (3) rental purchase agreements; (4) financial institutions; (5) pawnbrokers; (6) money transmitters; and (7) check cashers. Changes references to the "Federal Consumer Credit Protection Act" to references to the "Consumer Credit Protection Act" throughout these statutes. Removes outdated references to: (1) the Office of Thrift Supervision; and (2) the Federal Reserve Board; throughout the statutes. In the statute concerning rental purchase agreements: (1) repeals the definition of "Federal Consumer Credit Protection Act"; and (2)
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Burton [R] | Rep. Justin Moed [D] | Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. Greg Walker [R] |
Sen. Frank Mrvan [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Public Law 159 |
2017-04-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 442: yeas 75, nays 18 |
2017-04-06 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senator Walker added as second sponsor |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 345: yeas 46, nays 0 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as cosponsor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-20 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2017-02-01 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-01-31 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Holdman |
2017-01-31 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 41: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2017-01-30 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-24 | House | Representative Moed added as coauthor |
2017-01-18 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2017-01-18 | House | Authored by Representative Burton |