IN HB1538 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits a local unit of government (unit) from establishing, mandating, or requiring a minimum wage that exceeds the state or federal minimum wage unless federal or state law provides otherwise. Allows a unit to establish wage rates in a contract to which the unit is a party.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minimum wage required by local unit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 27 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 59 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House - Amendment 2 (Tyler), failed (Y: 39 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-02-17 - House - House - Roll Call 201: yeas 55, nays 38 (Y: 55 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House - Roll Call 200: yeas 37, nays 58 (Y: 37 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-16 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-16 Public Law 211
2011-05-10 Signed by the Governor
2011-05-02 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-26 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-26 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-21 Returned to the House without amendments
2011-04-21 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 442: yeas 27 and nays 23
2011-04-14 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-04-12 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-03-31 First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce & Economic Development
2011-03-30 Senate sponsor: Senator Schneider
2011-03-30 Referred to the Senate
2011-03-30 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 363: yeas 59, nays 40
2011-03-28 Amendment 2 (Tyler), failed; Roll Call 268: yeas 39, nays 59
2011-03-28 Amendment 3 (Riecken), withdrawn
2011-03-28 Amendment 1 (Speedy), prevailed; voice vote
2011-03-28 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2011-02-17 Roll Call 201: yeas 55, nays 38
2011-02-17 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-02-17 Roll Call 200: yeas 37, nays 58
2011-02-17 Minority report not substituted for majority report
2011-01-20 First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2011-01-20 Authored by Representative Speedy

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2011&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=HB&docno=1538
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/IN/IN1538.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/HB/HB1538.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/HB/HB1538.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/EH/EH1538.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/HE/HE1538.1.html
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Hrollcal/0200.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Hrollcal/0201.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Hrollcal/0268.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Hrollcal/0363.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Srollcal/0442.PDF.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback