IN HB1537 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Public Law 62
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Commission on improving the status of children. Changes the membership of the commission on improving the status of children in Indiana (commission). Provides that the affirmative votes of a majority of the voting members appointed to the commission are required for the commission to take action on any measure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commission on improving the status of children.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15HousePublic Law 62
2021-04-15HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-08SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-07HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-03-30SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2021-03-30SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2021-03-29SenateSenator Leising added as cosponsor
2021-03-29SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 283: yeas 49, nays 0
2021-03-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-23SenateSenator Ford Jon added as second sponsor
2021-03-22SenateSenator Breaux added as cosponsor
2021-03-22SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-02-18SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
2021-02-03HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-02HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Donato
2021-02-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 56: yeas 93, nays 0
2021-02-01HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-28HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
2021-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representatives Engleman, McNamara, Summers
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative DeVon

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1537/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/1/3/2d130273/HB1537.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/7/0/4/6704d8c5/HB1537.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/4/b/f94be31f/HB1537.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/8/0/6/18060655/HB1537.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/0/8/2908ee79/HB1537.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/6/f/1c6f22e4/HB1537.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/3/6/8d36007a/HB1537.04.ENRS.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/5/b/b95b0fe0/HB1537.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/b/e/26be5b09/HB1537.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/0/a/2d0a65c6/HB1537.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/5/5/48558a1e/HB1537.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/c/0/c/ec0cdfb3/HB1537.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/6/c/486c7a7f/HB1537.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/9/5/b1951598/HB1537.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/1/e/c31e6668/HB1537.03.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/b/d/b7bd336d/HB1537.03.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/1/6/76167062/HB1537.04.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/4/c/fa4ca8c4/HB1537.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/b/6/a2b637f4/HB1537.56_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/3/e/e73e5498/HB1537.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/9/f/f09fb952/HB1537.283_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback