IN HB1534 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-20 - First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Government and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-20 - First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Government and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that an employee of a political subdivision is considered to have resigned from employment with the political subdivision if the employee assumes the elected executive office of the political subdivision or becomes an elected member of the political subdivision's legislative or fiscal body. Provides that the restriction applies to an employee of a political subdivision who assumes an elected office after June 30, 2012. Provides that the restriction does not prohibit an employee of a political subdivision from holding an elected office of a political subdivision other than the political subdivision that employs the government employee. Eliminates township boards in all counties other than Marion County effective January 1, 2015. Specifies that after December 31, 2014, in all counties other than Marion County: (1) the county fiscal body is the fiscal body and legislative body of the township; and (2) the county fiscal body shall exercise the legislative and fiscal powers assigned in the Indiana Code to township boards, including the authority to adopt the township's annual budget and to levy township property taxes for township funds. Establishes a board of trustees (board) in each county, consisting of all township trustees in the county. Requires the board to prepare a county plan (plan) for providing township assistance in the county. Provides that
Title
Township reorganization and government employees.
Sponsors
Rep. Ralph Foley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-20 | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform | |
2011-01-20 | Authored by Representative Foley |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2011&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=HB&docno=1534 |
Text | http://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/IN/IN1534.1.html |