IN HB1519 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Public Law 91
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Infrastructure development zone utility service. Provides that facilities used by a wastewater utility in the collection or treatment of wastewater constitute "eligible infrastructure" for purposes of the law providing a property tax exemption to a person who invests in eligible infrastructure located in an infrastructure development zone. Authorizes a public utility that provides water utility service to petition the utility regulatory commission (IURC) for approval of a plan (plan) to develop a future source of water source supply. Requires the IURC to approve the plan if the IURC finds that the plan is reasonable and prudent for the provision of

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Infrastructure development zone utility service. Provides that facilities used by a wastewater utility in the collection or treatment of wastewater constitute "eligible infrastructure" for purposes of the law providing a property tax exemption to a person who invests in eligible infrastructure located in an infrastructure development zone. Authorizes a public utility that provides water utility service to petition the utility regulatory commission (IURC) for approval of a plan (plan) to develop a future source of water source supply. Requires the IURC to approve the plan if the IURC finds that the plan is reasonable and prudent for the provision of

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-12 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-20HousePublic Law 91
2017-04-20HouseSigned by the Governor
2017-04-20SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-17HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-12HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 477: yeas 82, nays 0
2017-04-12HouseMotion to concur filed
2017-04-06SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2017-04-06SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 426: yeas 48, nays 0
2017-04-05SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2017-04-05SenateAmendment #3 (Charbonneau) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-05SenateAmendment #1 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-05SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-04-03SenateSenator Niezgodski added as cosponsor
2017-04-03SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-03-27SenateSenator Koch added as cosponsor
2017-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Utilities
2017-02-23HouseReferred to the Senate
2017-02-22HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau, Eckerty and Ford
2017-02-22HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 202: yeas 94, nays 0
2017-02-21HouseAmendment #1 (Ober) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-21HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-20HouseRepresentative Pierce added as coauthor
2017-02-16HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-02HouseRepresentative Ober added as coauthor
2017-01-18HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications
2017-01-18HouseAuthored by Representative VanNatter

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/house/1519/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/b/9/f4b90c49/HB1519.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/4/a/f34a9a2d/HB1519.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/c/c/8/0cc81c4c/HB1519.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/4/4/104487ac/HB1519.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/2/8/f528d9ed/HB1519.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/6/c/166cf701/HB1519.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/8/c/c88c5f8a/HB1519.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/6/a/c/f6ac2ae8/HB1519.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/a/4/14a4e63d/HB1519.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/b/e/5dbe8240/HB1519.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/5/c/7/85c75f20/HB1519.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/4/c/0/c4c000c2/HB1519.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/8/3/f/b83f9e55/HB1519.202.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/e/0/55e006ee/HB1519.03.ENGH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/f/0/f/9f0fac00/HB1519.426.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/8/3/4883b216/HB1519.477.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback