IN HB1513 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 241
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 241
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
FSSA matters. Changes the name of the bureau of developmental disabilities services to the bureau of disabilities services. Removes certain members from the 211 advisory committee. Repeals Medicaid copayment provisions that: (1) require the office of the secretary of family and social services (office) to apply a copayment for certain Medicaid services; (2) require a recipient to make a copayment upon the receipt of services and for a provider not to voluntarily waive a copayment; (3) set forth exemptions from copayment requirements; and (4) require the provider to charge the maximum allowable copayment. Allows for an enrollment fee, a premium, a copayment, or a similar charge to be imposed as a condition of an individual's eligibility for the healthy Indiana plan and the children's health insurance program. Removes a prohibition on the office from: (1) requiring certain providers to submit non-Medicaid revenue information in the provider's annual historical financial report; and (2) only requesting balance sheets from certain providers that apply directly to the provider's facility. Allows the office to implement an end of therapy reclassification methodology in a successor of the RUG-IV, 48-Group model for payment of nursing facility services.
Title
FSSA matters.
Sponsors
Rep. Bradford Barrett [R] | Rep. Gregory Porter [D] | Rep. Becky Cash [R] | Rep. Julie Olthoff [R] |
Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Barrett) prevailed (Y: 68 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Barrett) prevailed (Y: 68 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | House | Public Law 241 |
2023-05-04 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 511: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2023-04-26 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 519: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2023-04-26 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Melton and Busch |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Charbonneau and Hunley |
2023-04-19 | House | House advisors appointed: Cash, Olthoff and Fleming |
2023-04-19 | House | House conferees appointed: Barrett and Porter |
2023-04-19 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2023-04-19 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 447: yeas 44, nays 6 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Charbonneau) prevailed; voice vote |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-02-16 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 149: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2023-02-16 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Charbonneau |
2023-02-16 | House | Representative Olthoff added as coauthor |
2023-02-16 | House | Representative Cash B added as coauthor |
2023-02-14 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2023-02-14 | House | Amendment #1 (Barrett) prevailed; Roll Call 112: yeas 68, nays 27 |
2023-02-09 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-02-09 | House | Representative Porter added as coauthor |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2023-01-31 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-19 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2023-01-19 | House | Authored by Representative Barrett |
Subjects
FAMILY AND SOCIAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
HEALTH generally
MENTAL HEALTH, Mentally Ill or Impaired Persons
NURSING HOMES
HEALTH generally
MENTAL HEALTH, Mentally Ill or Impaired Persons
NURSING HOMES