IN HB1496 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Public Law 21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Natural resource matters. Provides that a permit issued to a quarrying or aggregate company for excavation of certain industrial materials is valid for the duration of the permitted project subject to periodic compliance evaluations. Establishes that a permit issued for aggregate operations becomes void if construction has not commenced within two years of the issuance of the permit. Requires a permit holder to notify the commission within six months after completing a permitted project. Provides that a permit issued on or before July 1, 2014, that remains active for a quarrying or aggregate company for excavation of certain industrial materials is valid for the duration of the permitted project subject to permit conditions and periodic evaluations, and requires the holder of the permit to notify the commission not later than January 1, 2022, if the permitted project is still active. Provides that failure to notify the commission will cause the permit to expire. Requires the holder of the permit to notify the commission that the project is completed within six months after the project's completion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural resource matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Floor - (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01HousePublic Law 21
2021-04-01HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-03-31SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-03-29SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-03-23HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-03-17SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2021-03-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 235: yeas 48, nays 0
2021-03-11SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-09SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
2021-02-19HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-18HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Houchin and Doriot
2021-02-18HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 188: yeas 85, nays 3
2021-02-16HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-11HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
2021-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representative Eberhart
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Bartels

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1496/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/b/1/b/0b1be614/HB1496.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/8/a/ea8a0f34/HB1496.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/0/b/420b850f/HB1496.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/3/7/443718e9/HB1496.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/e/d/c/5edc0b80/HB1496.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/f/9/93f91cfa/HB1496.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/6/a/436aaa10/HB1496.04.ENRS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/4/2/1542260e/HB1496.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/a/7/73a76824/HB1496.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/f/7/8ef7bf9f/HB1496.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/b/a/76ba1545/HB1496.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/b/0/20b08a31/HB1496.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/4/7/8/b478fd09/HB1496.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/7/f/2f7fbb3e/HB1496.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/b/6/3/fb638dc2/HB1496.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/e/1/b9e1855c/HB1496.03.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/c/c/c5cc80de/HB1496.03.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/e/3/7fe30fce/HB1496.04.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/d/d/e3dd6ba5/HB1496.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/d/0/52d056b7/HB1496.188_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/e/3/00e3f04b/HB1496.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/1/8/8f18133d/HB1496.235_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback