IN HB1495 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Public Law 200
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Public Law 200
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Environmental management. Authorizes an ex officio advisory member of the Indiana recycling market development board to designate a representative to serve in an advisory capacity when the ex officio member is unable to attend a board meeting. Amends the law concerning certain facilities for the composting of vegetative matter to require that the facilities be designed and operated to prevent contamination from stormwater and leachate runoff and to require the use of controls at the facilities for ground water or surface water contamination, dust, odor, and noise. Amends the law on the recycling of electronic waste: (1) to require manufacturers
Title
Environmental management. Authorizes an ex officio advisory member of the Indiana recycling market development board to designate a representative to serve in an advisory capacity when the ex officio member is unable to attend a board meeting. Amends the law concerning certain facilities for the composting of vegetative matter to require that the facilities be designed and operated to prevent contamination from stormwater and leachate runoff and to require the use of controls at the facilities for ground water or surface water contamination, dust, odor, and noise. Amends the law on the recycling of electronic waste: (1) to require manufacturers
Sponsors
Rep. David Wolkins [R] | Rep. Doug Gutwein [R] | Rep. Sue Errington [D] | Sen. Eric Bassler [R] |
Sen. Doug Eckerty [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Public Law 200 |
2017-04-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 486: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2017-04-18 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 496: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2017-04-17 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Eckerty, Niezgodski and Doriot |
2017-04-10 | House | House advisors appointed: Aylesworth, Beumer and Harris |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Bassler and Stoops |
2017-04-10 | House | House conferees appointed: Wolkins and Errington |
2017-04-06 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2017-04-06 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 315: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senator Buck added as cosponsor |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Bassler) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-23 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-20 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Bassler and Eckerty |
2017-02-20 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 149: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2017-02-16 | House | Amendment #3 (Harris) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-02-16 | House | Amendment #1 (Eberhart) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-02-16 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-24 | House | Representatives Gutwein and Errington added as coauthors |
2017-01-18 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2017-01-18 | House | Authored by Representative Wolkins |