IN HB1486 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 261
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 261
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
New septic system technology. Requires the state department of health (state department) to establish a technical review panel consisting of individuals who hold certain positions or have certain qualifications relevant to onsite sewage systems or who represent certain organizations to which onsite sewage systems are important. Requires the technical review panel to decide whether "technology new to Indiana" (or "TNI", which refers to a sewage treatment method or process or sewage treatment equipment that is not recognized in the administrative rules of the state department or the executive board of the state department) is approved for general use in Indiana. Requires the technical review panel, in response to an application, to decide that a TNI: (1) is approved for general use in Indiana; (2) is approved for use in Indiana with certain conditions; (3) is approved for use in Indiana on a project-by-project basis; or (4) is not approved for use in Indiana. Requires the technical review panel to inform an applicant of the technical review panel's initial or final decision on a complete application not more than 90 days after notifying the applicant that it received the application. Requires the technical review panel to approve a TNI for general use in Indiana if: (1) the TNI has been certified as meeting the NSF/ANSI 40 Standard; (2) a proposed Indiana design and installation manual for the TNI is submitted with the permit application; and (3) the technical review panel certifies that the proposed Indiana design and installation manual meets the vertical and horizontal separation, sizing, and soil loading criteria of the state department. Provides that if: (1) a TNI meets the requirements of the NSF/ANSI 40, NSF/ANSI 245, or NSF/ANSI 350 standard; (2) the proposed Indiana design and installation manual for the TNI meets the vertical and horizontal separation, sizing, and soil loading criteria of the state department; and (3) a registered Indiana professional engineer prepares site specific plans for the use of the TNI in a residential or commercial application; the site specific plans may be approved by the local health department within 30 days, if the TNI is to be used in a residential application, and shall be approved by the state department upon submission of the site specific plans, if the TNI is to be used in a commercial application.
Title
New septic system technology. Requires the state department of health (state department) to establish a technical review panel consisting of individuals who hold certain positions or have certain qualifications relevant to onsite sewage systems or who represent certain organizations to which onsite sewage systems are important. Requires the technical review panel to decide whether "technology new to Indiana" (or "TNI", which refers to a sewage treatment method or process or sewage treatment equipment that is not recognized in the administrative rules of the state department or the executive board of the state department) is approved for general use in Indiana. Requires the technical review panel, in response to an application, to decide that a TNI: (1) is approved for general use in Indiana; (2) is approved for use in Indiana with certain conditions; (3) is approved for use in Indiana on a project-by-project basis; or (4) is not approved for use in Indiana. Requires the technical review panel to inform an applicant of the technical review panel's initial or final decision on a complete application not more than 90 days after notifying the applicant that it received the application. Requires the technical review panel to approve a TNI for general use in Indiana if: (1) the TNI has been certified as meeting the NSF/ANSI 40 Standard; (2) a proposed Indiana design and installation manual for the TNI is submitted with the permit application; and (3) the technical review panel certifies that the proposed Indiana design and installation manual meets the vertical and horizontal separation, sizing, and soil loading criteria of the state department. Provides that if: (1) a TNI meets the requirements of the NSF/ANSI 40, NSF/ANSI 245, or NSF/ANSI 350 standard; (2) the proposed Indiana design and installation manual for the TNI meets the vertical and horizontal separation, sizing, and soil loading criteria of the state department; and (3) a registered Indiana professional engineer prepares site specific plans for the use of the TNI in a residential or commercial application; the site specific plans may be approved by the local health department within 30 days, if the TNI is to be used in a residential application, and shall be approved by the state department upon submission of the site specific plans, if the TNI is to be used in a commercial application.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Bartels [R] | Rep. Doug Miller [R] | Rep. Jim Pressel [R] | Rep. Terry Goodin [D] |
Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-05 | House | Public Law 261 |
2019-05-05 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-24 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 631: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 612: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2019-04-24 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as advisor |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as conferee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski removed as advisor |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senator Stoops removed as conferee |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Doriot and Niezgodski |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Messmer and Stoops |
2019-04-18 | House | House advisors appointed: Miller D, Pressel and Errington |
2019-04-18 | House | House conferees appointed: Bartels and Goodin |
2019-04-18 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2019-04-18 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 493: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Niezgodski) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as second sponsor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as cosponsor |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Doriot |
2019-02-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 256: yeas 96, nays 1 |
2019-02-20 | House | Amendment #1 (Bartels) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-02-20 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-16 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-16 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Miller D, Pressel and Goodin |
2019-01-16 | House | Authored by Representative Bartels |