IN HB1464 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 206
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Business law. Provides that the secretary of state (secretary) may remove a name or assumed name from its entity filing records if a name or assumed name falsely indicates or implies that the domestic filing entity or the foreign filing entity is, or is connected with, a government agency of this state, another state, or the United States. Expands what qualifies as an emergency as it relates to shareholder meetings. Sets forth the actions a corporation may take to address an emergency, including postponing a meeting or conducting a meeting by means of remote communication. Provides that a nonprofit corporation may hold meetings by means of remote communication, if provided for in the nonprofit corporation's bylaws. Allows a public corporation governed by IC 23-1 to elect not to have a staggered board system if the board of directors adopts a bylaw expressly electing not to. Provides that trademark filings shall be submitted electronically to the secretary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29HousePublic Law 206
2021-04-29HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-23SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-08HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 393: yeas 86, nays 0
2021-04-06HouseMotion to concur filed
2021-03-17SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-03-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 234: yeas 48, nays 0
2021-03-15SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-11SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-02-23SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-02-09HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-08HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Zay and Holdman
2021-02-08HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 91: yeas 93, nays 0
2021-02-04HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-02HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development
2021-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representative Heaton
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Carbaugh

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1464/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/1/1/2c117efd/HB1464.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/3/0/383087f0/HB1464.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/c/7/adc782ff/HB1464.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/4/e/4/24e43c30/HB1464.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/1/f/5f1f59d2/HB1464.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/2/4/56246a8a/HB1464.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/a/1/3ea1477a/HB1464.04.ENRS.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/1/6/f/c16f0a07/HB1464.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/4/f/1b4fd487/HB1464.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/1/6/4a16a293/HB1464.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/1/9/e619698b/HB1464.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/e/2/76e2317c/HB1464.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/d/1/12d1c724/HB1464.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/7/3/8/1738007e/HB1464.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/c/f/8/ecf8a3c3/HB1464.03.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/a/b/05ab0fae/HB1464.03.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/7/b/297bde42/HB1464.03.COMS.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/1/a/f01a4b87/HB1464.04.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/3/8/3738814b/HB1464.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/b/a/03bae34c/HB1464.91_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/9/f/a19f85f1/HB1464.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/6/7/6467c2cd/HB1464.234_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/3/e/1/53e1ab32/HB1464.393_H.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback