IN HB1463 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 29 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - Senator Ruckelshaus added as advisor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 29 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - Senator Ruckelshaus added as advisor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Teachers' defined contribution plan. Establishes the teachers' defined contribution plan (plan) as an account within the Indiana state teachers' retirement fund (fund). Provides that an individual who begins employment with a school corporation in a covered position that would otherwise be eligible for membership in the fund may elect to become a member of the plan. Provides that an individual who does not elect to become a member of the plan becomes a member of the fund. Requires the board of trustees of the Indiana public retirement system (board) to establish, subject to any approval from the Internal Revenue Service
Title
Teachers' defined contribution plan. Establishes the teachers' defined contribution plan (plan) as an account within the Indiana state teachers' retirement fund (fund). Provides that an individual who begins employment with a school corporation in a covered position that would otherwise be eligible for membership in the fund may elect to become a member of the plan. Provides that an individual who does not elect to become a member of the plan becomes a member of the fund. Requires the board of trustees of the Indiana public retirement system (board) to establish, subject to any approval from the Internal Revenue Service
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] | Rep. David Ober [R] | Rep. Todd Huston [R] | Rep. Gerald Torr [R] |
Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Sen. John Ruckelshaus [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senator Ruckelshaus added as advisor |
2017-04-11 | House | House advisors appointed: Huston, Torr, Moseley and Taylor J |
2017-04-11 | House | House conferees appointed: Carbaugh and Forestal |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Walker and Melton |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Boots and Niezgodski |
2017-04-06 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2017-04-06 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as cosponsor |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senator Ruckelshaus added as second sponsor |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 314: yeas 26, nays 24 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Boots) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Boots) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-03-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2017-02-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-27 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Boots |
2017-02-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 230: yeas 68, nays 25 |
2017-02-23 | House | Amendment #1 (Carbaugh) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-02-23 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-02-21 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-20 | House | Representatives Ober, Huston, Torr added as coauthors |
2017-01-18 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2017-01-18 | House | Authored by Representative Carbaugh |