IN HB1454 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Enrolled on April 7 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Senate advisors appointed: Zay and Melton
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Nonemergency ambulance service orders. Requires hospitals to establish protocols for within the hospital concerning the issuance of orders for nonemergency transportation. Requires a physician to issue an order for nonemergency ambulance services when a patient needs transportation by an ambulance. Specifies contents of an order. Allows for certification of a physician's order by certain providers if certain conditions are met.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nonemergency ambulance service orders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenateSenate advisors appointed: Zay and Melton
2021-04-12SenateSenate conferees appointed: Charbonneau and Breaux
2021-04-12HouseHouse advisors appointed: Barrett, Vermilion and Shackleford
2021-04-12HouseHouse conferees appointed: Baird and Fleming
2021-04-08HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2021-04-08HouseMotion to dissent filed
2021-04-07SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-04-06SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2021-04-06SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 358: yeas 50, nays 0
2021-04-05SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-04-01SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-02SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2021-02-23HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-22HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau and Zay
2021-02-22HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 210: yeas 93, nays 0
2021-02-17HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-16HouseRepresentative Fleming added as coauthor
2021-02-16HouseRepresentatives Barrett and Vermilion A added as coauthors
2021-02-15HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Baird

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1454/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/3/7/bb37f78a/HB1454.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/5/f/935f7f78/HB1454.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/a/3/93a3555b/HB1454.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/8/8/3888ff8d/HB1454.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/d/1/7bd1ed17/HB1454.03.COMS.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/6/8/1/06817c20/HB1454.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/5/8/e/858e80a8/HB1454.01.INTR.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/c/3/66c35dd4/HB1454.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/a/e/e/0aeeb707/HB1454.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/7/c/3/d7c389b1/HB1454.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/4/9/7/c497b811/HB1454.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/7/d/427dec26/HB1454.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/1/e/eb1e73dd/HB1454.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/a/e/5/8ae5e9fc/HB1454.03.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/3/8/9/33893c14/HB1454.03.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/4/d/804d278c/HB1454.03.COMS.DIS01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/8/8/5688008b/HB1454.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/d/9/2bd9b941/HB1454.210_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/9/b/4a9bb622/HB1454.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/5/d/0/65d04fa3/HB1454.358_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback