IN HB1451 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Public Law 85
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Public Law 85
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Unemployment compensation. Amends the definition of "deductible income" for purposes of the unemployment compensation laws. Provides that, subject to certain exceptions, the department of workforce development may accept an offer in compromise from an employer or claimant to reduce past due debts arising from contributions or benefit overpayments. Provides that an individual is ineligible for benefits for any week that the individual receives payments equal to or exceeding the individual's weekly benefit amount in pension, retirement, or annuity payments under any plan of an employer where the employer contributes all of the money. (Under current law, the disqualification provision applies under any plan of an employer where the employer contributes a portion or all of the money.) Provides that the state of Indiana is not required to participate in or precluded from ceasing to participate in any offered or enacted voluntary, optional, special, or emergency federal program. Makes corresponding changes.
Title
Unemployment compensation.
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] | Rep. Heath VanNatter [R] | Rep. Ryan Hatfield [D] | Sen. Greg Walker [R] |
Sen. Linda Rogers [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Public Law 85 |
2023-04-20 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 245: yeas 42, nays 0 |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as second sponsor |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-02-28 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2023-02-22 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-02-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 183: yeas 89, nays 0 |
2023-02-21 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Walker G |
2023-02-16 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-02-13 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-02-06 | House | Representatives VanNatter and Hatfield added as coauthors |
2023-01-17 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2023-01-17 | House | Authored by Representative Carbaugh |
Subjects
INCOME TAXES, Deductions
INDIANA PUBLIC RETIREMENT SYSTEM (formerly PERF)
LABOR AND EMPLOYMENT, State Department and Agencies
LABOR AND EMPLOYMENT, Unemployment Compensation
PENSIONS
INDIANA PUBLIC RETIREMENT SYSTEM (formerly PERF)
LABOR AND EMPLOYMENT, State Department and Agencies
LABOR AND EMPLOYMENT, Unemployment Compensation
PENSIONS