IN HB1449 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 235
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 235
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Twenty-first century scholars program. Provides that the commission for higher education shall do the following: (1) In cooperation with the department of education, identify students who meet the requirements to participate in the twenty-first century scholars program (program). (2) Notify the student and the custodial parent or guardian of the student, if the student is an unemancipated minor, that: (A) the student is eligible to participate in the program; (B) the student must agree to the conditions required to participate in the program; and (C) the student has the right to opt out of the program at any time.
Title
Twenty-first century scholars program.
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Harris [D] | Rep. Vernon Smith [D] | Rep. Robert Behning [R] | Rep. Robert Morris [R] |
Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. Eddie Melton [D] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Fady Qaddoura [D] |
Sen. Shelli Yoder [D] | Sen. J.D. Ford [D] | Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | House | Public Law 235 |
2023-05-04 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-04-19 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 456: yeas 89, nays 1 |
2023-04-17 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Senator Becker added as cosponsor |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 374: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senators Ford J.D. and Leising added as cosponsors |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as cosponsor |
2023-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-02-16 | House | Representative Morris added as coauthor |
2023-02-16 | House | Representative Davis M removed as coauthor |
2023-02-16 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 148: yeas 92, nays 1 |
2023-02-16 | House | Cosponsor: Senator Qaddoura |
2023-02-16 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Raatz, Melton, Ford Jon |
2023-02-13 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-02-09 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-02-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2023-02-02 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-30 | House | Representatives Behning and Davis M added as coauthors |
2023-01-17 | House | Representative Smith, V. added as coauthor |
2023-01-17 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2023-01-17 | House | Authored by Representative Harris |
Subjects
EDUCATION, Secretary of Education, State Department and Boards
HIGHER EDUCATION, Colleges and Universities
INCOME TAXES, Adjusted Gross Income Taxes
STUDENT ASSISTANCE, LOANS, AND GRANTS
HIGHER EDUCATION, Colleges and Universities
INCOME TAXES, Adjusted Gross Income Taxes
STUDENT ASSISTANCE, LOANS, AND GRANTS