IN HB1431 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Public Law 197
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Public Law 197
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Executive sessions and open records. Provides that a governing body may admit to an executive session of the governing body an individual who has been elected to the governing body but has not been sworn in as a member of the governing body. Allows a state educational institution to: (1) meet in executive session to discuss certain matters concerning establishment of a collaborative relationship or venture to advance the research, engagement, or education mission of the state educational institution; and (2) withhold records from public disclosure that are created while the negotiations are in progress. Amends the tabulation of a
Title
Executive sessions and open records. Provides that a governing body may admit to an executive session of the governing body an individual who has been elected to the governing body but has not been sworn in as a member of the governing body. Allows a state educational institution to: (1) meet in executive session to discuss certain matters concerning establishment of a collaborative relationship or venture to advance the research, engagement, or education mission of the state educational institution; and (2) withhold records from public disclosure that are created while the negotiations are in progress. Amends the tabulation of a
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 84 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Public Law 197 |
2017-04-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 481: yeas 84, nays 3 |
2017-04-12 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 281: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-23 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-16 | House | Cosponsor: Senator Niezgodski |
2017-02-16 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Brown L, Kruse and Ruckelshaus |
2017-02-16 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 138: yeas 87, nays 1 |
2017-02-13 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-09 | House | Representatives Pryor and Engleman added as coauthors |
2017-02-09 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-01-17 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-01-17 | House | Coauthored by Representative Lehman |
2017-01-17 | House | Authored by Representative GiaQuinta |