IN HB1424 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Handgun licenses. Increases the duration of a four year handgun license to five years. Provides that an individual may simultaneously hold both a five year license and a lifetime license. Requires a law enforcement officer to whom an application for a handgun license is made to perform a national, fingerprint based criminal history check and consult available local, state, and federal criminal history data banks, including the National Instant Criminal Background Check System (NICS), when determining whether possession of a firearm by an applicant would be a violation of state or federal law. Removes the fees for lifetime licenses beginning
Title
Handgun licenses. Increases the duration of a four year handgun license to five years. Provides that an individual may simultaneously hold both a five year license and a lifetime license. Requires a law enforcement officer to whom an application for a handgun license is made to perform a national, fingerprint based criminal history check and consult available local, state, and federal criminal history data banks, including the National Instant Criminal Background Check System (NICS), when determining whether possession of a firearm by an applicant would be a violation of state or federal law. Removes the fees for lifetime licenses beginning
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Wesco [R] | Rep. Ben Smaltz [R] | Rep. Steven Stemler [D] | Rep. Peggy Mayfield [R] |
Sen. Rodric Bray [R] | Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 71 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 71 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senator Ford added as third sponsor |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as second sponsor |
2018-02-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-02-05 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Bray |
2018-02-05 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 146: yeas 71, nays 20 |
2018-01-31 | House | Representatives Stemler and Mayfield added as coauthors |
2018-01-31 | House | Amendment #1 (Wesco) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-01-31 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-01-29 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2018-01-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-16 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2018-01-16 | House | Coauthored by Representative Smaltz |
2018-01-16 | House | Authored by Representative Wesco |