IN HB1421 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 198
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 198
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Various health care matters. Provides that the state employee health plan statute does not prohibit the state personnel department from directly contracting with health care providers for health care services for state employees. Provides that if a woman who is in premature labor presents to a hospital, the hospital must inform the woman of the hospital's capabilities of treating the born alive infant and managing a high risk pregnancy. Sets forth requirements that a hospital must meet concerning: (1) a woman who is in premature labor; and (2) a born alive infant. Changes the date that ambulatory outpatient surgical centers are required to begin posting certain pricing information from March 31, 2021, to December 31, 2021. Specifies that the pricing information posted is the standard charge rather than the weighted average negotiated charge and sets forth what is included in the standard charge. Specifies that if an ambulatory outpatient surgical center offers less than 30 additional services, the center is required to post all of the services the center provides. Requires a hospital to post pricing information in compliance with the federal Hospital Price Transparency Rule of the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services as in effect on January 1, 2021, if: (1) the federal Hospital Price Transparency Rule is repealed; or (2) federal enforcement of the federal Hospital Price Transparency Rule is stopped. Defines "health carrier" for purposes of the law on health provider contracts. Prohibits the inclusion in a health provider contract of any provision that would: (1) prohibit the disclosure of health care service claims data, including for use in the all payer claims data base; (2) limit the ability of a health carrier or health provider facility to disclose the allowed amount and fees of services to any insured or enrollee, or to the treating health provider facility or physician of the insured or enrollee; or (3) limit the ability of a health carrier or health provider facility to disclose out-of-pocket costs to an insured or an enrollee. Requires the department of insurance to issue a report to: (1) the legislative council; and (2) the interim study committees on financial institutions and insurance and public health, behavioral health, and human services; setting forth its suggestions for revising the department's administrative rules to reduce the regulatory costs incurred by employers seeking to provide health coverage for their employees through multiple employer welfare arrangements.
Title
Various health care matters.
Sponsors
Rep. Donna Schaibley [R] | Rep. Robert Heaton [R] | Rep. Ryan Lauer [R] | Rep. Anthony Cook [R] |
Sen. Elizabeth Brown [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Andy Zay [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Public Law 198 |
2021-04-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-04-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 463: yeas 37, nays 11 |
2021-04-20 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 470: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2021-04-19 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senator Gaskill added as conferee |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senator Yoder removed as conferee |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Charbonneau and Breaux |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Brown L and Yoder |
2021-04-08 | House | House advisors appointed: Heaton, Lauer and Campbell |
2021-04-08 | House | House conferees appointed: Schaibley and Austin |
2021-04-06 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2021-04-06 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 307: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-03-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2021-02-22 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Brown L, Charbonneau, Zay |
2021-02-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 214: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2021-02-17 | House | Amendment #7 (Austin) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-02-17 | House | Amendment #1 (Schaibley) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-02-17 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-02-15 | House | Representatives Lauer and Cook added as coauthors |
2021-02-15 | House | Representative Heaton added as coauthor |
2021-02-11 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-01-14 | House | Reassigned to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2021-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2021-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Schaibley |