IN HB1418 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-17 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-17 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the consumer protection division of the office of the attorney general (division) to establish the child protection registry. Permits a person to register "contact points" that belong to a minor with the registry. Defines a contact point to be: (1) an electronic mail address; (2) an instant message identity; (3) a mobile or other telephone number; or (4) a similar point of communication defined by rule by the division. Permits a school or other institution that primarily serves minors to register its domain name with the registry. Provides that a person may not send a communication to a contact point that has been registered for more than 30 days if the communication: (1) has the express purpose of advertising or promoting a product or service that a minor is prohibited by law from purchasing; or (2) contains or has the express purpose of advertising or promoting material that is harmful to minors, as described in Indiana law. Authorizes persons who send such communications to check the registry for a fee to enable compliance with the law. Authorizes the division to adopt rules to administer the statute and the registry. Provides for civil enforcement of the statute.
Title
Child protection registry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-10 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-10 | Senate sponsor: Senator Head | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-02-10 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 133: yeas 94, nays 0 | |
2011-02-08 | Amendment 2 (Foley), prevailed; voice vote | |
2011-02-08 | Amendment 1 (Turner), prevailed; voice vote | |
2011-02-08 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-27 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-18 | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs | |
2011-01-18 | Coauthored by Representatives Turner and Welch | |
2011-01-18 | Authored by Representative McNamara |