IN HB1404 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-16 - First Reading: Referred to Environmental Affairs
Pending: House Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that, after December 31, 2014, a person may not start: (1) the construction of a concentrated animal feeding operation (CAFO); or (2) an expansion of a CAFO that would increase animal capacity or manure containment capacity, or both; without obtaining the prior approval of the department of environmental management. Requires, after December 31, 2014, a person who applies or has applied to the department of environmental management for approval of a confined feeding operation or CAFO, or for an individual water pollution control permit for a CAFO, to prove the person's financial ability to pay for closure, postclosure monitoring and maintenance, spill response, and compensation of third parties for bodily injury and property damage in the event of an accidental or intentional release from the person's confined feeding operation or CAFO. Requires the environmental rules board to adopt rules to become effective not later than January 1, 2015, concerning the financial ability requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Confined feeding financial ability requirements.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-16HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Environmental Affairs
2014-01-15HouseAuthored by Representative Saunders.

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback