IN HB1396 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-16 - Representative McNamara added as coauthor
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Teacher salaries. Establishes the teacher supplemental compensation fund (fund). Increases the cigarette tax by $1 to $1.995 per pack of regular size cigarettes (and a corresponding increase for larger cigarettes) with the additional revenue deposited in the fund. Provides that the budget agency may approve to deposit into the fund: (1) amounts reverted to the state general fund in a state fiscal year from funds appropriated; or (2) money in the state general fund attributable to the collection of sales tax from retailers without a physical presence in Indiana. Provides that, for each school year beginning after June 30, 2019, and before July 1, 2022, each teacher who provides classroom instruction is entitled to a supplemental payment in excess of the salary specified in the school corporation's compensation plan in the amount of $2,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teacher salaries. Establishes the teacher supplemental compensation fund (fund). Increases the cigarette tax by $1 to $1.995 per pack of regular size cigarettes (and a corresponding increase for larger cigarettes) with the additional revenue deposited in the fund. Provides that the budget agency may approve to deposit into the fund: (1) amounts reverted to the state general fund in a state fiscal year from funds appropriated; or (2) money in the state general fund attributable to the collection of sales tax from retailers without a physical presence in Indiana. Provides that, for each school year beginning after June 30, 2019, and before July 1, 2022, each teacher who provides classroom instruction is entitled to a supplemental payment in excess of the salary specified in the school corporation's compensation plan in the amount of $2,000.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-16HouseRepresentative McNamara added as coauthor
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representative Cherry
2019-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Cook

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback