IN HB1388 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes changes to the information a teacher preparation program must annually submit to the department of education (department). Requires certain additional information to be included on the department's Internet web site. Specifies that the department, the commission for higher education, the Independent Colleges of Indiana, Inc., and teacher preparation programs must establish a matrix rating system for teacher preparation programs. Provides that a transition to teaching program participant may obtain a license to teach in prekindergarten if the participant meets certain requirements. Requires principals and teachers to complete surveys concerning beginning teacher preparation.
Title
Teacher preparation programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 138803 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 138801 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 138803 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 138801 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-13 | House | Public Law 192 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 460: yeas 40 and nays 8 |
2014-03-13 | House | Representative Huston added as conferee |
2014-03-13 | House | Representative V. Smith removed as conferee |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 501: yeas 75 and nays 23 |
2014-03-12 | House | Representative V. Smith removed as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Broden added as conferee |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as conferee |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative Errington added as advisor |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative Thompson added as advisor |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative Rhoads added as advisor |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative V. Smith added as conferee |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative Behning added as conferee |
2014-03-05 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 341: yeas 43 and nays 4 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | HB 1388 Amendment #1 (Banks), prevailed. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | HB 1388 Amendment #3 (Yoder), prevailed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Broden added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Education and Career Development |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-02-03 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 208: yeas 95 and nays 0 |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Yoder added as first sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Kruse added as second sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Representative V. Smith added as coauthor. |
2014-01-30 | House | HB 1388 Amendment #4 (Huston), prevailed. |
2014-01-30 | House | HB 1388 Amendment #3 (Smith, V.), prevailed. |
2014-01-30 | House | HB 1388 Amendment #1 (Smith, V.), prevailed. |
2014-01-30 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-15 | House | First Reading: Referred to Education |
2014-01-15 | House | Authored by Representative Behning. |