IN HB1387 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Makes changes to the definition of an agricultural commodity. Transfers the responsibility for certain duties concerning commodity market development from the director of the department of agriculture to the Purdue University dean of agriculture (dean). Requires the dean to conduct a referendum on the continuation of the commodity market development council if the amount of refund requests under the commodity market development program exceeds 25% of the amount collected under the program for a fiscal year. (Current law requires a referendum one time every three years.) Allows a state commodity fee to be collected for an agricultural commodity even if a fee is collected under a federal program for promotion or market development.
Title
Commodity market development councils.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 130 | |
2011-05-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-02 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-26 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 674: yeas 86, nays 0 | |
2011-04-05 | Senator Delph added as cosponsor | |
2011-04-05 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2011-04-05 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 304: yeas 50 and nays 0 | |
2011-03-31 | Senator R. Young added as cosponsor | |
2011-03-31 | Amendment 2 (Head), prevailed; | |
2011-03-31 | Amendment 1 (R. Young), prevailed; | |
2011-03-31 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-03-15 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-14 | Senator Hume added as cosponsor | |
2011-03-14 | Senator Mishler added as cosponsor | |
2011-03-10 | Senator Tomes added as cosponsor | |
2011-02-17 | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2011-01-31 | Representative Grubb added as coauthor | |
2011-01-31 | Senate sponsors: Senators Head and Alting | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 58: yeas 94, nays 3 | |
2011-01-27 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-25 | Representative Bacon added as coauthor | |
2011-01-25 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-18 | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development | |
2011-01-18 | Coauthored by Representative Baird | |
2011-01-18 | Authored by Representative Lehe |