IN HB1384 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Civics education. Requires, not later than July 1, 2022, the state board of education, in coordination with the department of education, to establish standards for civics education. Establishes the: (1) Indiana civic education commission; and (2) duties of the commission. Provides that each school corporation, charter school, and state accredited nonpublic school shall require each student to successfully complete in grade 6, 7, or 8 one semester of a civics education course. Provides that the civics education standards in effect on July 2, 2022, may only be changed by the express authorization of the general assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civics education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-07SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-01SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-03-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-03-25HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 307: yeas 88, nays 1
2021-03-22HouseMotion to concur filed
2021-03-17SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-03-16SenateSenator Yoder added as cosponsor
2021-03-16SenateSenator Buck added as cosponsor
2021-03-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 233: yeas 49, nays 0
2021-03-15SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor
2021-03-15SenateAmendment #1 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote
2021-03-15SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-03-11SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-04SenateSenator Walker K added as cosponsor
2021-03-04SenateSenators Rogers and Leising added as cosponsors
2021-03-04SenateSenator Qaddoura added as cosponsor
2021-03-04SenateSenator Kruse added as cosponsor
2021-03-04SenateSenator Buchanan added as second sponsor
2021-03-04SenateSenator Raatz added as sponsor
2021-03-04SenateSenator Buchanan removed as sponsor
2021-03-04SenateSenator Raatz removed as second sponsor
2021-02-24SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2021-02-19HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-18HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Buchanan, Raatz, Crane
2021-02-18HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 196: yeas 96, nays 1
2021-02-16HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-11HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2021-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representatives Thompson, Cherry, Schaibley
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Cook

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1384/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/8/9/3789d526/HB1384.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/c/2/8fc27146/HB1384.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/8/b/d/a8bd8395/HB1384.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/5/c/9/e5c9bd67/HB1384.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/2/0/7920f990/HB1384.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/4/8/b/c48b23e8/HB1384.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/c/b/71cbf103/HB1384.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/8/9/5/18958a90/HB1384.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/8/0/6680ac8f/HB1384.05.ENRS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/5/d/6/95d623d8/HB1384.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/b/0/5/0b053037/HB1384.03.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/1/c/1/d1c1b404/HB1384.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/4/c/134cf3c5/HB1384.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/2/5/8/d258cba2/HB1384.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/7/a/da7a784d/HB1384.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/5/f/ee5fcfdb/HB1384.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/4/4/e/244e3558/HB1384.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/3/1/783197b8/HB1384.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/a/7/fea75f49/HB1384.04.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/9/9/2/d9928128/HB1384.04.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/4/5/bc452626/HB1384.04.ENGS.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/e/9/c/6e9ca090/HB1384.05.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/a/d/f9ad1191/HB1384.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/e/7/3ce7a9ef/HB1384.196_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/f/9/0/bf90fd81/HB1384.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/8/d/e18ddbda/HB1384.233_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/e/7/d3e7e718/HB1384.307_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback