IN HB1382 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 283
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 283
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Controlled substances.
Title
Controlled substances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 283 |
2013-05-11 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-26 | House | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 294: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law |
2013-02-19 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Bray |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-19 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 159: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2013-02-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-14 | House | Representative Lawson added as coauthor |
2013-02-14 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-01-22 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2013-01-22 | House | Authored by Representative Kirchhofer |