IN HB1370 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Cemetery perpetual care fund. Provides that a cemetery: (1) consisting solely of a columbarium installed before January 1, 2025; (2) that is located on property consisting of at least 40 acres that is owned by a nonprofit organization with a focus on veterans that is exempt from federal income taxation under Section 501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code; and (3) that is located on property that was owned by the nonprofit organization before January 1, 2024; is not required to establish a perpetual care fund.
Title
Cemetery perpetual care fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] | Rep. Christopher Judy [R] | Rep. David Abbott [R] | Rep. Renee Pack [D] |
Sen. Justin Busch [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2024-01-30 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 100: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2024-01-30 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Busch |
2024-01-30 | House | Representative Pack R added as coauthor |
2024-01-29 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-01-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2024-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Carbaugh |
2024-01-10 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Judy and Abbott |