IN HB1370 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Regional redevelopment. Provides that a public instrumentality or a public corporate body authorized by state law may enter into an interlocal agreement. Allows two or more eligible units to establish a land bank jointly by entering into an interlocal agreement.
Title
Regional redevelopment.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris May [R] | Rep. Chris Chyung [D] | Rep. Gerald Torr [R] | Sen. Mark Messmer [R] |
Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Public Law 26 |
2020-03-11 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 249: yeas 45, nays 0 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as cosponsor |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as second sponsor |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-01-28 | House | Representative Torr added as coauthor |
2020-01-28 | House | Representative Chyung added as coauthor |
2020-01-28 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Messmer |
2020-01-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 112: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2020-01-27 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-23 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-01-15 | House | Authored by Representative May |