IN HB1369 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 23 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-09 - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: rejected by the Senate; Roll Call 378: yeas 21, nays 29
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Sentencing modification. Establishes a procedure to allow certain inmates in the department of correction (department) an additional opportunity to request sentence modification from the sentencing court if the department has recommended sentence modification. Requires that an inmate who receives sentence modification be placed under supervision of: (1) a community transition program; (2) a court; (3) community corrections program; or (4) a supervised reentry program. Requires the department to annually transmit certain information concerning sentence modification to the Indiana criminal justice institute.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sentencing modification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 21 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-08 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Floor - (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-09SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: rejected by the Senate; Roll Call 378: yeas 21, nays 29
2022-03-08HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 398: yeas 65, nays 33
2022-03-08SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2022-03-08HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2022-03-08SenateSenator Walker K added as conferee
2022-03-08SenateSenator Crider removed as conferee
2022-03-08SenateSenator Crider added as conferee
2022-03-08SenateSenator Taylor G removed as conferee
2022-03-08SenateSenator Crider removed as advisor
2022-03-08HouseRepresentative Jeter added as conferee
2022-03-08HouseRepresentative Pierce removed as conferee
2022-03-03SenateSenate advisors appointed: Crider and Pol
2022-03-03SenateSenate conferees appointed: Young M and Taylor G
2022-03-01HouseHouse advisors appointed: Steuerwald, McNamara, Speedy and Hatcher
2022-03-01HouseHouse conferees appointed: Morris and Pierce
2022-03-01HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2022-02-28HouseMotion to dissent filed
2022-02-23SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2022-02-22SenateSenator Bohacek added as second sponsor
2022-02-22SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 245: yeas 48, nays 0
2022-02-21SenateAmendment #1 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote
2022-02-21SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2022-02-17SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2022-02-10SenateSenator Garten removed as second sponsor
2022-02-10SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2022-02-01HouseReferred to the Senate
2022-01-31HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Young M and Garten
2022-01-31HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 153: yeas 90, nays 5
2022-01-27HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2022-01-24HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2022-01-11HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2022-01-11HouseCoauthored by Representative McNamara
2022-01-11HouseAuthored by Representative Morris

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2022/bills/house/1369/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/0/d/3c0df981/HB1369.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/0/d/300d02c4/HB1369.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/7/5/7/67578f4d/HB1369.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/1/4/41142fba/HB1369.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/0/a/870a0029/HB1369.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/7/c/6/47c6d138/HB1369.04.ENGS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/7/b/cc7b1f18/HB1369.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/f/d/dcfddcbb/HB1369.03.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/5/e/3b5ed4e5/HB1369.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/6/c/806ce710/HB1369.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/2/7/362762ca/HB1369.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/4/f/544fafd3/HB1369.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/8/5/cc853284/HB1369.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/3/5/44352faa/HB1369.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/d/c/5/edc52e9e/HB1369.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/4/6/19460c7d/HB1369.04.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/a/7/4/3a74ca5e/HB1369.04.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/6/6/1b66c400/HB1369.04.ENGS.DIS01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/d/7/10d7fbe0/HB1369.01.INTR.05.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/f/a/46fac5bb/HB1369.153_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/1/4/30149781/HB1369.02.COMH.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/2/4/f424d945/HB1369.245_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/9/6/9d96157a/HB1369.378_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/a/d/9cadf67f/HB1369.398_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback