IN HB1367 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Public Law 173
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Public Law 173
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health facility requirements concerning residents. Requires a health facility to disclose to each prospective resident in writing: (1) information concerning the long term care ombudsman, including contact information for the long term care ombudsman and the state department of health; and (2) any policy under which a resident would be required to pay a full monthly rate regardless of whether the resident resides at the facility for the whole month. Requires that in the development and execution of a care plan for the resident that a health facility facilitate, at the request of the resident, the inclusion of a resident representative.
Title
Health facility requirements concerning residents. Requires a health facility to disclose to each prospective resident in writing: (1) information concerning the long term care ombudsman, including contact information for the long term care ombudsman and the state department of health; and (2) any policy under which a resident would be required to pay a full monthly rate regardless of whether the resident resides at the facility for the whole month. Requires that in the development and execution of a care plan for the resident that a health facility facilitate, at the request of the resident, the inclusion of a resident representative.
Sponsors
Rep. Terri Jo Austin [D] | Rep. Robin Shackleford [D] | Rep. Cindy Kirchhofer [R] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] |
Sen. John Ruckelshaus [R] | Sen. J.D. Ford [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Randall Head [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - Third reading (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - Third reading (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Public Law 173 |
2019-05-01 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 595: yeas 87, nays 0 |
2019-04-22 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senator Head added as cosponsor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 427: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-20 | House | Representative Kirchhofer added as coauthor |
2019-02-20 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Becker, Ruckelshaus and Ford J.D. |
2019-02-20 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 246: yeas 99, nays 0 |
2019-02-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-14 | House | Representative Shackleford added as coauthor |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2019-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Austin |