IN HB1365 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the first responding volunteer fire department to recover attorney's fees and costs incurred by the department in an action to recover unpaid service charges. Prohibits a volunteer fire department funded by taxes imposed by a unit or by a contract with a unit from imposing a charge on persons who reside or pay property taxes in the unit unless the spill or chemical or hazardous material fire poses an imminent threat to persons or property. Provides that a bill for a service charge by a volunteer fire department must contain: (1) verification that the bill has been approved by the chief of the volunteer fire department; and (2) language indicating that correspondence from the person being billed regarding the bill should be directed to the department. Provides that all bills sent by an agent of a volunteer fire department must be approved by the chief of the volunteer fire department before it is sent to the person being billed for services, and specifies that the chief of the volunteer fire department must review a bill before authorizing an agent to proceed with collection efforts for that bill.
Title
Volunteer fire department recovery of costs.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Dodge [R] | Rep. Craig Fry [D] | Rep. Timothy Neese [R] | Rep. David Yarde [R] |
Rep. David Yarde [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 73 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 208 | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-02 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-27 | Representative C. Fry added as coauthor | |
2011-04-26 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 673: yeas 73, nays 11 | |
2011-04-21 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2011-04-21 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 436: yeas 49 and nays 0 | |
2011-04-18 | Senator Hume added as cosponsor | |
2011-04-18 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-14 | Senators Arnold, Steele and Holdman added as cosponsors | |
2011-04-12 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-28 | Representative Yarde added as coauthor | |
2011-02-22 | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters | |
2011-02-21 | Senate sponsor: Senator Zakas | |
2011-02-21 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-02-21 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 217: yeas 88, nays 11 | |
2011-02-17 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-15 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-24 | Representative Neese added as coauthor | |
2011-01-18 | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety | |
2011-01-18 | Authored by Representative Dodge |