IN HB1360 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 173
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 173
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Realtor continuing education. Provides that following every license renewal period, the Indiana real estate commission (commission) in consultation with the professional licensing agency may randomly audit for compliance more than 1% but less than 10% of the licensed real estate brokers required to take continuing education courses. Requires a real estate continuing education course sponsor to submit certain documentation to the commission. Adds to the conditions under which the commission may deny, suspend, or revoke approval of a course sponsor. Allows the commission to enter into an agreement with certain entities to provide an electronic continuing education tracking system.
Title
Realtor continuing education. Provides that following every license renewal period, the Indiana real estate commission (commission) in consultation with the professional licensing agency may randomly audit for compliance more than 1% but less than 10% of the licensed real estate brokers required to take continuing education courses. Requires a real estate continuing education course sponsor to submit certain documentation to the commission. Adds to the conditions under which the commission may deny, suspend, or revoke approval of a course sponsor. Allows the commission to enter into an agreement with certain entities to provide an electronic continuing education tracking system.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Morris [R] | Rep. Doug Gutwein [R] | Rep. Heath VanNatter [R] | Rep. John Bartlett [D] |
Sen. Elizabeth Brown [R] | Sen. James Merritt [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | Public Law 173 |
2016-03-23 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-07 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2016-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 389: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 300: yeas 49, nays 1 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2016-02-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce & Technology |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2016-02-01 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Brown L and Merritt |
2016-02-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 93: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2016-01-28 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-26 | House | Representatives Gutwein, VanNatter, Bartlett added as coauthors |
2016-01-26 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-01-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2016-01-12 | House | Authored by Representative Morris |